Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Sexual Orientation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130
Title
Commission on LGBTQ Affairs – Established
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0216 (SB0155)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0231 (SB0046)
Title
Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 (SB0488)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0650 (SB0765)
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Sexual and Gender Minorities (Imari's Business Pride Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0783 (SB0425)
Title
Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930
Title
Family Law - Removal of Child From Home - Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Vehicle Laws - Policies and Prohibition Against Discriminatory Traffic Stops
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1088 (SB0768)
Title
Nondiscrimination and LGBTQ+ Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1118
Title
Health Care Facilities – Discrimination
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258
Title
Health Enterprise Zones - Established (Restoring the Promise Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046 (HB0231)
Title
Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 (HB0216)
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0425 (HB0783)
Title
Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0488 (HB0449)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0765 (HB0650)
Title
Minority Business Enterprises – Sexual and Gender Minorities (Imari’s Business Pride Act)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0768 (HB1088)
Title
Nondiscrimination and LGBTQ+ Individuals
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0130 Commission on LGBTQ Affairs – Established Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0216 (SB0155) Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0231 (SB0046) Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0449 (SB0488) Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0650 (SB0765) Minority Business Enterprises - Sexual and Gender Minorities (Imari's Business Pride Act) Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0783 (SB0425) Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
HB0930 Family Law - Removal of Child From Home - Meetings Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1046 Vehicle Laws - Policies and Prohibition Against Discriminatory Traffic Stops Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1088 (SB0768) Nondiscrimination and LGBTQ+ Individuals Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1118 Health Care Facilities – Discrimination Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1258 Health Enterprise Zones - Established (Restoring the Promise Act of 2021) Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0046 (HB0231) Crimes - Mitigation and Defense - Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0155 (HB0216) Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0425 (HB0783) Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences Senator Augustine 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Ways and Means
SB0488 (HB0449) Family Law - Marriage - Licenses and Records Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0765 (HB0650) Minority Business Enterprises – Sexual and Gender Minorities (Imari’s Business Pride Act) Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0768 (HB1088) Nondiscrimination and LGBTQ+ Individuals Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 9:23 AM
Click to return on the top page