Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Sheriffs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176 /CH0542
Title
Courts – Service of Process – Fees Collected by Sheriff
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 13-22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382 /CH0613 (SB0439/CH0614)
Title
Somerset County – Local Officials – Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488
Title
Local Public Campaign Financing – Expansion to Additional Offices
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0620 /CH0547 (SB0341/CH0548)
Title
Caroline County - State's Attorney and Sheriff - Salaries
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0728 (SB0371/CH0276)
Title
Carroll County – Prospective Employees and Volunteers – Criminal History Records Check
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0873
Title
Washington County - Sheriff's Salary - Alteration
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885 /CH0538
Title
Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Ho. Co. 03-22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1309
Title
Landlord and Tenant – Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent – Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HS0001
Title
Articles of Impeachment of Governor Lawrence J. Hogan, Jr.
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0132
Title
Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0341 /CH0548 (HB0620/CH0547)
Title
Caroline County - State's Attorney and Sheriff - Salaries
Sponsor
Caroline County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347
Title
Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Failure to Pay Rent
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371 /CH0276 (HB0728)
Title
Carroll County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 /CH0614 (HB0382/CH0613)
Title
Somerset County - Local Officials - Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0746
Title
Frederick County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Frederick County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0176 /CH0542 Courts – Service of Process – Fees Collected by Sheriff Delegate Cardin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 542
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0362 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 13-22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0382 /CH0613 (SB0439/CH0614) Somerset County – Local Officials – Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses Delegate Otto 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 613
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0488 Local Public Campaign Financing – Expansion to Additional Offices Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0620 /CH0547 (SB0341/CH0548) Caroline County - State's Attorney and Sheriff - Salaries Delegate Ghrist 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 547
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0728 (SB0371/CH0276) Carroll County – Prospective Employees and Volunteers – Criminal History Records Check Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Rules
HB0873 Washington County - Sheriff's Salary - Alteration Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0885 /CH0538 Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Ho. Co. 03-22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 538
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1309 Landlord and Tenant – Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent – Procedures Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HS0001 Articles of Impeachment of Governor Lawrence J. Hogan, Jr. Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2022 - 8:00 AM
SB0132 Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer Senator Bailey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0341 /CH0548 (HB0620/CH0547) Caroline County - State's Attorney and Sheriff - Salaries Caroline County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 548
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0347 Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Failure to Pay Rent Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0371 /CH0276 (HB0728) Carroll County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0439 /CH0614 (HB0382/CH0613) Somerset County - Local Officials - Salaries and Daily Allowance for Traveling Expenses Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 614
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0746 Frederick County - Sheriff - Salary Frederick County Senators 4 2 In the House - Third Reading Failed (57-65)
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 3:43 PM
Click to return on the top page