Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Shore Erosion

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023
Title
Environment - Wetlands - Landward Boundaries
Sponsor
Delegate Hutchinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1175 (SB0898)
Title
Nutrient Management - Tidal Buffer - Vegetative Buffers and Restriction on Fertilizer Application
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1348
Title
Home Improvement Contractors - Disaster Mitigating Services - Regulation and Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1467
Title
Local Finance - Special Taxing Districts - Anne Arundel County Erosion Prevention Projects and Erosion Control Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0250
Title
Department of the Environment - Fees, Penalties, Funding, and Regulation
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB1175)
Title
Nutrient Management – Tidal Buffer – Vegetative Buffers and Restriction on Fertilizer Application
Sponsor
Senator Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0959
Title
Environment - Wetlands - Landward Boundaries
Sponsor
Senator Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1023 Environment - Wetlands - Landward Boundaries Delegate Hutchinson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1175 (SB0898) Nutrient Management - Tidal Buffer - Vegetative Buffers and Restriction on Fertilizer Application Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1348 Home Improvement Contractors - Disaster Mitigating Services - Regulation and Prohibition Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 11:00 a.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
4/07/2025 - 11:00 AM
HB1467 Local Finance - Special Taxing Districts - Anne Arundel County Erosion Prevention Projects and Erosion Control Projects Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0250 Department of the Environment - Fees, Penalties, Funding, and Regulation Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0898 (HB1175) Nutrient Management – Tidal Buffer – Vegetative Buffers and Restriction on Fertilizer Application Senator Love 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0959 Environment - Wetlands - Landward Boundaries Senator Mautz 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/8/2025 12:05 AM
Click to return on the top page