Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Sidewalks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0019
Title
Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0371 (SB0246)
Title
Environment - Salt Applicator Certification Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1153
Title
Vehicle Laws – Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles – Riding on Sidewalks
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0246 (HB0371)
Title
Environment - Salt Applicator Certification Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 /CH0038
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0019 Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0371 (SB0246) Environment - Salt Applicator Certification Program - Establishment Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1153 Vehicle Laws – Bicycles, Play Vehicles, and Unicycles – Riding on Sidewalks Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0246 (HB0371) Environment - Salt Applicator Certification Program - Establishment Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0528 /CH0038 Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 38
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:35 PM
Click to return on the top page