Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Smart Growth -see also- Zoning and Planning

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1031 (SB0791)
Title
Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046
Title
Housing and Community Development - Programs and Projects - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756
Title
University System of Maryland - County School Technology Pilot Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB1031)
Title
Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1031 (SB0791) Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0046 Housing and Community Development - Programs and Projects - Requirements Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0756 University System of Maryland - County School Technology Pilot Program - Established Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0791 (HB1031) Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/4/2022 10:39 AM
Click to return on the top page