Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Smoking and Vaping -see also- Cannabis; Cigarettes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0442 (SB0249)
Title
Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0477 (SB0099)
Title
Cigarettes, Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices – Local Law Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0837 /CH0026
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1227
Title
Regulation of Tobacco Products - Synthetic Nicotine
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295
Title
Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1341
Title
Prince George’s County – Other Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices – Requirements and Limitations
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099 (HB0477)
Title
Cigarettes, Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices – Local Law Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0249 (HB0442)
Title
Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0990
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibitions and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0442 (SB0249) Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0477 (SB0099) Cigarettes, Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices – Local Law Authorization Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0837 /CH0026 Cannabis Reform Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Judiciary
2/14/2022 - 10:00 AM
Finance
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1227 Regulation of Tobacco Products - Synthetic Nicotine Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1295 Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1341 Prince George’s County – Other Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices – Requirements and Limitations Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0099 (HB0477) Cigarettes, Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices – Local Law Authorization Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0249 (HB0442) Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0990 Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibitions and Requirements Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:37 PM
Click to return on the top page