Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Social Security

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0033
Title
Fairness in Taxation for Retirees Act
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529
Title
Consumer Protection - Required Disclosure of Social Security Number - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0700 (SB0679/CH0574)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Nail Technicians
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0772 (SB0262)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0992
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 (HB0772)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0465
Title
Community Colleges - Tuition Waiver for Disabled Individuals - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0679 /CH0574 (HB0700)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Nail Technicians
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0033 Fairness in Taxation for Retirees Act Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0529 Consumer Protection - Required Disclosure of Social Security Number - Prohibition Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0700 (SB0679/CH0574) Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Nail Technicians Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0772 (SB0262) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0992 Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - Repeal Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0262 (HB0772) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0465 Community Colleges - Tuition Waiver for Disabled Individuals - Requirements Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0679 /CH0574 (HB0700) Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Nail Technicians Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM
Click to return on the top page