Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Soil Conservation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028 /CH0236 (SB0939/CH0237)
Title
Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0783 (SB0993)
Title
Task Force to Study Behavioral and Mental Health in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1219
Title
Calvert County – Soil Percolation Tests – Validity
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0993 (HB0783)
Title
Task Force to Study Behavioral and Mental Health in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 /CH0236 (SB0939/CH0237) Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2019 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0783 (SB0993) Task Force to Study Behavioral and Mental Health in Maryland Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1219 Calvert County – Soil Percolation Tests – Validity Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0993 (HB0783) Task Force to Study Behavioral and Mental Health in Maryland Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page