Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Solar Energy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220 (SB0053)
Title
Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0332
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible Sources
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0376 /CH0174 (SB0153/CH0175)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Municipal Electric Utilities
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419 (SB0460)
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 (SB0414)
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0584 /CH0624 (SB0508/CH0625)
Title
Public Utilities – Net Energy Metering
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 /CH0449
Title
Montgomery County - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program MC 17-21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0954 (SB0841)
Title
Property Tax – Solar Energy Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1356
Title
Blue Ribbon Solar Land Use Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362
Title
Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES)
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0053 (HB0220)
Title
Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0153 /CH0175 (HB0376/CH0174)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Municipal Electric Utilities
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 (HB0583)
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 (HB0419)
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0508 /CH0625 (HB0584/CH0624)
Title
Public Utilities - Net Energy Metering
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0841 (HB0954)
Title
Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940
Title
Public Safety - Fire Prevention Codes and Maryland Building Performance Standards - Solar Energy Generating Systems
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0220 (SB0053) Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0332 Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible Sources Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0376 /CH0174 (SB0153/CH0175) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Municipal Electric Utilities Delegate Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Economic Matters
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0419 (SB0460) Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives Delegate Qi 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Economic Matters
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0583 (SB0414) Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021 Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0584 /CH0624 (SB0508/CH0625) Public Utilities – Net Energy Metering Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 624
Economic Matters
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0768 /CH0449 Montgomery County - Community Choice Energy - Pilot Program MC 17-21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 449
Economic Matters
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0954 (SB0841) Property Tax – Solar Energy Systems Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1356 Blue Ribbon Solar Land Use Commission Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1362 Clean and Renewable Energy Standard (CARES) Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0053 (HB0220) Clean Energy Attribute Credits and Procurement Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0153 /CH0175 (HB0376/CH0174) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Municipal Electric Utilities Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Finance
1/21/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0414 (HB0583) Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0460 (HB0419) Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives Senator Feldman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0508 /CH0625 (HB0584/CH0624) Public Utilities - Net Energy Metering Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0841 (HB0954) Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0940 Public Safety - Fire Prevention Codes and Maryland Building Performance Standards - Solar Energy Generating Systems Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:18 PM
Click to return on the top page