Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Solar Energy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0031 /CH0734 (SB0256/CH0735)
Title
Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0076 /CH0415 (SB0264)
Title
Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Property Taxes
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0440 /CH0581 (SB0110)
Title
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Net Energy Metering and Generating Capacity
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0624 (SB0334)
Title
Electricity - Standard Offer Service - Renewable Energy
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0818
Title
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generation - Consolidated Billing
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0831
Title
Reducing Greenhouse Gas Emissions - Commercial and Residential Buildings
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Renewable Energy Credits - Solar Energy Sources
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0894
Title
Transportation Electrification and Modernization (TEAM) Act
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0936 (SB0999)
Title
Blue Ribbon Community Solar Land Use Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1039 /CH0658 (SB0860/CH0659)
Title
Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Agrivoltaics
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1250
Title
Task Force to Study Solar Energy Incentives
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1261 (SB0733)
Title
Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1484
Title
Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Program - Solar Electric Photovoltaic Property and Solar Batteries - Grant Amounts
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0110 (HB0440/CH0581)
Title
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Generating Capacity
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 /CH0735 (HB0031/CH0734)
Title
Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264 (HB0076/CH0415)
Title
Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Property Taxes
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334 (HB0624)
Title
Long-Term Power Purchase Agreements for Renewable Energy Workgroup and Minority-Owned and Women-Owned Businesses Study
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 /CH0038
Title
Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0616
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Eligible Sources – Waste–to–Energy and Refuse–Derived Fuel
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0733 (HB1261)
Title
Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0860 /CH0659 (HB1039/CH0658)
Title
Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Agrivoltaics
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0999 (HB0936)
Title
Blue Ribbon Community Solar Land Use Commission
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0031 /CH0734 (SB0256/CH0735) Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734
Economic Matters
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0076 /CH0415 (SB0264) Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Property Taxes Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Ways and Means
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0440 /CH0581 (SB0110) Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Net Energy Metering and Generating Capacity Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Economic Matters
Finance
HB0624 (SB0334) Electricity - Standard Offer Service - Renewable Energy Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0818 Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generation - Consolidated Billing Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0831 Reducing Greenhouse Gas Emissions - Commercial and Residential Buildings Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0864 Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Renewable Energy Credits - Solar Energy Sources Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0894 Transportation Electrification and Modernization (TEAM) Act Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0936 (SB0999) Blue Ribbon Community Solar Land Use Commission Delegate Barve 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Finance
HB1039 /CH0658 (SB0860/CH0659) Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Agrivoltaics Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1250 Task Force to Study Solar Energy Incentives Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
Economic Matters
Finance
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1261 (SB0733) Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program - Alterations Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1484 Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Program - Solar Electric Photovoltaic Property and Solar Batteries - Grant Amounts Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0110 (HB0440/CH0581) Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Generating Capacity Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0256 /CH0735 (HB0031/CH0734) Maryland Energy Administration – Resiliency Hub Grant Program and Fund Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735
Finance
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0264 (HB0076/CH0415) Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Property Taxes Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2022 - 2:45 PM
SB0334 (HB0624) Long-Term Power Purchase Agreements for Renewable Energy Workgroup and Minority-Owned and Women-Owned Businesses Study Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0528 /CH0038 Climate Solutions Now Act of 2022 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 38
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0616 Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Eligible Sources – Waste–to–Energy and Refuse–Derived Fuel Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0733 (HB1261) Community Solar Energy Generating Systems Pilot Program - Alterations Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0860 /CH0659 (HB1039/CH0658) Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Agrivoltaics Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0999 (HB0936) Blue Ribbon Community Solar Land Use Commission Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:30 PM
Click to return on the top page