Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Somerset County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0168 (SB0488)
Title
Manufacturing Business Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391
Title
County Boards of Education - Elections for Members Representing Specific Districts - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498 (SB0427)
Title
Economic Development - Delivering Economic Competitiveness and Advancing Development Efforts (DECADE) Act
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720
Title
Natural Resources - Repeal of Somers Cove Marina Commission and Improvement Fund and Alteration of Operations
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0791 /CH0069 (SB0719/CH0070)
Title
Somerset County - Property Tax - Emergency Services Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0844 (SB0717)
Title
Somerset County - Salaries of Local Officials - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892 (SB0335)
Title
Natural Resources - Canada Geese - Bag Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0967 (SB0718)
Title
Somerset County Code of Public Local Laws - 2025 Edition - Legalization
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022 (SB0837)
Title
Oyster Restoration - Use of Federal Funds - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Hutchinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1238
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Tasting License
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0427 (HB0498)
Title
Economic Development - Delivering Economic Competitiveness and Advancing Development Efforts (DECADE) Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0488 (HB0168)
Title
Manufacturing Business Personal Property Tax - Optional Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0717 (HB0844)
Title
Somerset County - Salaries of Local Officials - Increase
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0718 (HB0967)
Title
Somerset County Code of Public Local Laws - 2025 Edition - Legalization
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0719 /CH0070 (HB0791/CH0069)
Title
Somerset County - Property Tax - Emergency Services Tax
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB1022)
Title
Oyster Restoration - Use of Federal Funds - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0168 (SB0488) Manufacturing Business Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0391 County Boards of Education - Elections for Members Representing Specific Districts - Alterations Delegate Long, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0498 (SB0427) Economic Development - Delivering Economic Competitiveness and Advancing Development Efforts (DECADE) Act Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0720 Natural Resources - Repeal of Somers Cove Marina Commission and Improvement Fund and Alteration of Operations Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0791 /CH0069 (SB0719/CH0070) Somerset County - Property Tax - Emergency Services Tax Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Ways and Means
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0844 (SB0717) Somerset County - Salaries of Local Officials - Increase Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Judicial Proceedings
HB0892 (SB0335) Natural Resources - Canada Geese - Bag Limits Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0967 (SB0718) Somerset County Code of Public Local Laws - 2025 Edition - Legalization Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1022 (SB0837) Oyster Restoration - Use of Federal Funds - Prohibition Delegate Hutchinson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1238 Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Tasting License Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/17/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0427 (HB0498) Economic Development - Delivering Economic Competitiveness and Advancing Development Efforts (DECADE) Act President 3 2 In the House - Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Ways and Means
Appropriations
SB0488 (HB0168) Manufacturing Business Personal Property Tax - Optional Exemption Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 2:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2025 - 2:15 PM
SB0717 (HB0844) Somerset County - Salaries of Local Officials - Increase Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0718 (HB0967) Somerset County Code of Public Local Laws - 2025 Edition - Legalization Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0719 /CH0070 (HB0791/CH0069) Somerset County - Property Tax - Emergency Services Tax Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0837 (HB1022) Oyster Restoration - Use of Federal Funds - Prohibition Senator Mautz 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/11/2025 5:53 PM
Click to return on the top page