Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Special Events

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0979 (SB0739/CH0666)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - BLX License PG 318-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1108 /CH0663
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Permits for Wineries
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 /CH0360 (SB0821/CH0359)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1364 /CH0687 (SB0946/CH0688)
Title
Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 /CH0258
Title
Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Duties of the Special Secretary - Minority Business Enterprises
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0739 /CH0666 (HB0979)
Title
Prince George’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – BLX License
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 /CH0359 (HB1232/CH0360)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0946 /CH0688 (HB1364/CH0687)
Title
Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0979 (SB0739/CH0666) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - BLX License PG 318-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1108 /CH0663 Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event Permits for Wineries Delegate Wivell 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1232 /CH0360 (SB0821/CH0359) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1364 /CH0687 (SB0946/CH0688) Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission Delegate Crosby 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 687
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/29/2021 - 9:30 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0689 /CH0258 Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Duties of the Special Secretary - Minority Business Enterprises Senator Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0739 /CH0666 (HB0979) Prince George’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – BLX License Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 666
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0821 /CH0359 (HB1232/CH0360) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0946 /CH0688 (HB1364/CH0687) Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission Senator Bailey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page