Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Special Tax Districts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0137 /CH0097
Title
Charles County - Taxing Districts for Infrastructure Improvements - Repeal of Restriction
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0428 (SB0143)
Title
Property Tax - Interest on Refunds
Sponsor
Delegate Sophocleus
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0602 /CH0354 (SB0141/CH0353)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Water or Wastewater Services
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1636 /CH0314 (SB1164)
Title
Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District and Distribution of Local Impact Grants
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 /CH0353 (HB0602/CH0354)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Water or Wastewater Services
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0143 (HB0428)
Title
Property Tax - Interest on Refunds
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1164 (HB1636/CH0314)
Title
Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Benefits District and Distribution of Local Impact Grants
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0137 /CH0097 Charles County - Taxing Districts for Infrastructure Improvements - Repeal of Restriction Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0428 (SB0143) Property Tax - Interest on Refunds Delegate Sophocleus 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0602 /CH0354 (SB0141/CH0353) Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Water or Wastewater Services Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB1636 /CH0314 (SB1164) Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District and Distribution of Local Impact Grants Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0141 /CH0353 (HB0602/CH0354) Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Water or Wastewater Services Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0143 (HB0428) Property Tax - Interest on Refunds Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB1164 (HB1636/CH0314) Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Benefits District and Distribution of Local Impact Grants Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-2)
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM
Click to return on the top page