Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Stadium Authority

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0020 /CH0017
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0416 (SB0399)
Title
State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0658 (SB0679/CH0269)
Title
Fair Hill Improvement Fund - Special Event Area and Operations
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0896 /CH0060
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Increase of Bond Authorization - Camden Yards
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 /CH0061
Title
Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1205 /CH0243 (SB0811)
Title
State Government – Information Technology and Cybersecurity–Related Infrastructure (Modernize Maryland Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290 /CH0032
Title
Education - Public School Construction - Funding and Administration
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0399 (HB0416)
Title
State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0679 /CH0269 (HB0658)
Title
Fair Hill Improvement Fund – Special Event Area and Operations
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0685
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Charles County Multicultural Recreational and Amphitheatre Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811 (HB1205/CH0243)
Title
State Government - Information Technology and Cybersecurity-Related Infrastructure (Modernize Maryland Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0911 /CH0252
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0020 /CH0017 Maryland Stadium Authority - Membership Delegate Chang 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17
Appropriations
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2022 - 1:15 PM
HB0416 (SB0399) State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0658 (SB0679/CH0269) Fair Hill Improvement Fund - Special Event Area and Operations Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0896 /CH0060 Maryland Stadium Authority - Increase of Bond Authorization - Camden Yards Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/08/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB0897 /CH0061 Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/08/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1205 /CH0243 (SB0811) State Government – Information Technology and Cybersecurity–Related Infrastructure (Modernize Maryland Act of 2022) Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1290 /CH0032 Education - Public School Construction - Funding and Administration Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32
Appropriations
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0399 (HB0416) State Government - Quasi-Governmental Units - Oversight and Governance President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0679 /CH0269 (HB0658) Fair Hill Improvement Fund – Special Event Area and Operations Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0685 Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Charles County Multicultural Recreational and Amphitheatre Facilities Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0811 (HB1205/CH0243) State Government - Information Technology and Cybersecurity-Related Infrastructure (Modernize Maryland Act of 2022) Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (115-15)
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2022 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Appropriations
SB0911 /CH0252 Maryland Stadium Authority - Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility - Alterations Senator Corderman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Finance
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 9:55 AM
Click to return on the top page