Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Stadiums

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862 (SB0367)
Title
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1076 /CH0646
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sports Stadium License MC 19-16
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 (SB0881)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269 (SB0223)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1474 (SB1038)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Downtown Frederick Conference Center
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0223 (HB1269)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0367 (HB0862)
Title
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0724 /CH0041
Title
Alcoholic Beverages Article
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB1266)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1038 (HB1474)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Downtown Frederick Conference Center
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0777 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0862 (SB0367) Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Act Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1076 /CH0646 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sports Stadium License MC 19-16 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 646
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1266 (SB0881) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1269 (SB0223) Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1474 (SB1038) Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Downtown Frederick Conference Center Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0223 (HB1269) Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0367 (HB0862) Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction Act Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0724 /CH0041 Alcoholic Beverages Article President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB1266) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Transfers, Sales, and Resales Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1038 (HB1474) Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Downtown Frederick Conference Center Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM
Click to return on the top page