Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Stadiums

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940 /CH0356
Title
Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1240 /CH0564 (SB0693/CH0565)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0693 /CH0565 (HB1240/CH0564)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0940 /CH0356 Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1240 /CH0564 (SB0693/CH0565) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 564
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0693 /CH0565 (HB1240/CH0564) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 565
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:19 PM
Click to return on the top page