Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Stadiums

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493 /CH0756 (SB0481)
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Service Under Stadium License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0520 (SB0483)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572 (SB0486)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 /CH0061
Title
Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0980
Title
Sports Wagering - Prince George's County Stadiums - Sports Wagering Community Impact Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Harrison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0481 (HB0493/CH0756)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Service Under Stadium License
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0483 (HB0520)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0572)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0911 /CH0252
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0493 /CH0756 (SB0481) Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Service Under Stadium License Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 756
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0520 (SB0483) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0572 (SB0486) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0897 /CH0061 Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/08/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB0980 Sports Wagering - Prince George's County Stadiums - Sports Wagering Community Impact Fund Delegate Harrison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0481 (HB0493/CH0756) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Service Under Stadium License Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0483 (HB0520) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 (HB0572) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0911 /CH0252 Maryland Stadium Authority - Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility - Alterations Senator Corderman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Finance
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:30 PM
Click to return on the top page