Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

State Documents -see also- Maryland Register

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0395 (SB0307)
Title
Public Records - Retention and Inspection - Communications (Transparency in Public Records Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0790 (SB0311)
Title
Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289
Title
Vehicle Laws - Learner's Instructional Permits and Identification Cards - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314
Title
Vehicle Laws - Pilot Program to Evaluate Alternative Registration Plates and Cards
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses and Identification Cards - Boating Safety Notation
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0218 /CH0119
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses and Identification Cards – Temporary Renewal
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 (HB0395)
Title
Public Records - Retention and Inspection - Communications (Transparency in Public Records Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311 (HB0790)
Title
Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546
Title
Vehicle Equipment – Transfer of Catalytic Converter – Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0395 (SB0307) Public Records - Retention and Inspection - Communications (Transparency in Public Records Act of 2022) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0790 (SB0311) Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1289 Vehicle Laws - Learner's Instructional Permits and Identification Cards - Required Documents Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1314 Vehicle Laws - Pilot Program to Evaluate Alternative Registration Plates and Cards Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0084 Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses and Identification Cards - Boating Safety Notation Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
SB0218 /CH0119 Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses and Identification Cards – Temporary Renewal Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0307 (HB0395) Public Records - Retention and Inspection - Communications (Transparency in Public Records Act of 2022) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0311 (HB0790) Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0546 Vehicle Equipment – Transfer of Catalytic Converter – Regulation Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:59 PM
Click to return on the top page