Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

State Documents -see also- Maryland Register

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093 (SB0196)
Title
Residential Ground Leases - Redemption and Extinguishment - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0114 (SB0039)
Title
Ballot Access - Affiliating With a Party - Unaffiliated Voters
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0817 (SB0649)
Title
State Government - Regulation Procedures and the Maryland Register
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039 (HB0114)
Title
Ballot Access - Affiliating With a Party - Unaffiliated Voters
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163
Title
Real Property - Recordation and Land Records - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 (HB0093)
Title
Residential Ground Leases - Redemption and Extinguishment - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649 (HB0817)
Title
State Government - Regulation Procedures and the Maryland Register
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0093 (SB0196) Residential Ground Leases - Redemption and Extinguishment - Requirements Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/31/2023 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0114 (SB0039) Ballot Access - Affiliating With a Party - Unaffiliated Voters Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/24/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0817 (SB0649) State Government - Regulation Procedures and the Maryland Register Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2023 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0039 (HB0114) Ballot Access - Affiliating With a Party - Unaffiliated Voters Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/16/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0163 Real Property - Recordation and Land Records - Requirements Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0196 (HB0093) Residential Ground Leases - Redemption and Extinguishment - Requirements Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0649 (HB0817) State Government - Regulation Procedures and the Maryland Register Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/07/2023 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2023 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/31/2023 11:42 AM
Click to return on the top page