Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

St. Mary's County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0474 /CH0755
Title
St. Mary's County - Leonardtown - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Place of Worship Distance Restriction
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0475
Title
St. Mary's County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0516
Title
St. Mary's County Human Relations Commission - Equal Treatment
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0522 /CH0597
Title
St. Mary's County - Tax Sales - Auctioneer Expenses
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0523
Title
St. Mary’s County – Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Definition
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0527 /CH0432
Title
St. Mary's County - Emergency Services Applicants - Polygraph Examinations
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633 (SB0933)
Title
Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022
Title
State Highway Administration - Route 5 Reconstruction Project at Great Mills
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Inspection and Severance Taxes - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933 (HB0633)
Title
Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0474 /CH0755 St. Mary's County - Leonardtown - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Place of Worship Distance Restriction St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 755
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0475 St. Mary's County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0516 St. Mary's County Human Relations Commission - Equal Treatment St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Washington) Adopted
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0522 /CH0597 St. Mary's County - Tax Sales - Auctioneer Expenses St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 597
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0523 St. Mary’s County – Newspaper or Newspaper in General Circulation – Definition St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0527 /CH0432 St. Mary's County - Emergency Services Applicants - Polygraph Examinations St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0633 (SB0933) Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0797 County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1022 State Highway Administration - Route 5 Reconstruction Project at Great Mills Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1217 Natural Resources - Oyster Inspection and Severance Taxes - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0933 (HB0633) Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:25 PM
Click to return on the top page