Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Storage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0908 /CH0715 (SB0271/CH0716)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139 /CH0414
Title
Higher Education - Heroin and Opioid Addiction and Prevention Policies - Exceptions and Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271 /CH0716 (HB0908/CH0715)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0908 /CH0715 (SB0271/CH0716) Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 715
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0139 /CH0414 Higher Education - Heroin and Opioid Addiction and Prevention Policies - Exceptions and Revisions Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0271 /CH0716 (HB0908/CH0715) Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 716
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:56 PM
Click to return on the top page