Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Strikes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 /CH0747 (SB0138/CH0748)
Title
Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0714 /CH0214 (SB0300/CH0215)
Title
Special Education - Learning Continuity Plan - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0894 (SB0746)
Title
Education – Community Colleges – Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913
Title
Board of Community College Trustees for Baltimore County - Collective Bargaining - Faculty
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0138 /CH0748 (HB0045/CH0747)
Title
Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0300 /CH0215 (HB0714/CH0214)
Title
Special Education – Learning Continuity Plan – Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0746 (HB0894)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 /CH0747 (SB0138/CH0748) Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining Delegate Forbes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 747
Appropriations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0714 /CH0214 (SB0300/CH0215) Special Education - Learning Continuity Plan - Requirement Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Ways and Means
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0894 (SB0746) Education – Community Colleges – Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0913 Board of Community College Trustees for Baltimore County - Collective Bargaining - Faculty Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0138 /CH0748 (HB0045/CH0747) Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining Senator Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 748
Finance
2/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0300 /CH0215 (HB0714/CH0214) Special Education – Learning Continuity Plan – Requirement Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
SB0746 (HB0894) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Senator Guzzone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page