Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Strikes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017
Title
Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0398 (SB0316)
Title
Abundant Affordable Clean Energy - Procurement and Development (AACE Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1509 (SB0976)
Title
Collective Bargaining - Local Government Employees and Public Employee Relations Act
Sponsor
Delegate Harris
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0316 (HB0398)
Title
Abundant Affordable Clean Energy - Procurement and Development (AACE Act)
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0340
Title
Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0494
Title
Procurement Contracts and Public-Private Partnerships - Project Labor Agreements, Community Benefit Agreements, and Use of Registered Apprentices
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0726
Title
Cannabis Licensees - Bona Fide Labor Organizations and Labor Peace Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0976 (HB1509)
Title
Collective Bargaining - Local Government Employees and Public Employee Relations Act
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2025 - 11:00 AM
HB0398 (SB0316) Abundant Affordable Clean Energy - Procurement and Development (AACE Act) Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1509 (SB0976) Collective Bargaining - Local Government Employees and Public Employee Relations Act Delegate Harris 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 2:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2025 - 2:30 PM
SB0316 (HB0398) Abundant Affordable Clean Energy - Procurement and Development (AACE Act) Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0340 Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2025 - 10:30 AM
SB0494 Procurement Contracts and Public-Private Partnerships - Project Labor Agreements, Community Benefit Agreements, and Use of Registered Apprentices Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
SB0726 Cannabis Licensees - Bona Fide Labor Organizations and Labor Peace Agreements Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0976 (HB1509) Collective Bargaining - Local Government Employees and Public Employee Relations Act Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/26/2025 1:58 PM
Click to return on the top page