Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Subpoenas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402 (SB0221)
Title
Department of the Environment - Enforcement Authority
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0151 (SB0446/CH0152)
Title
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Entities - Peer Support Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 (SB0512)
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Correctional Ombudsman
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638
Title
State Government - Attorney General - Independent Investigations Division
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 (SB0441)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board and Police Accountability Board
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0221 (HB0402)
Title
Department of the Environment – Enforcement Authority
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008)
Title
Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0446 /CH0152 (HB0581/CH0151)
Title
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Entities - Peer Support Programs
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0512 (HB0604)
Title
Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821
Title
Medical Excellence Zone Compact
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0896
Title
State Government - Attorney General - Independent Investigations Division
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 (SB0275/CH0048) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0402 (SB0221) Department of the Environment - Enforcement Authority Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0496 Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act 2022) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0581 /CH0151 (SB0446/CH0152) Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Entities - Peer Support Programs Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0604 (SB0512) Office of the Attorney General - Correctional Ombudsman Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0638 State Government - Attorney General - Independent Investigations Division Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0991 (SB0441) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board and Police Accountability Board Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1342 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0154 Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0221 (HB0402) Department of the Environment – Enforcement Authority President 6 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0275 /CH0048 (HB0008) Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022) Senator Hayes 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 48
Finance
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0446 /CH0152 (HB0581/CH0151) Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Entities - Peer Support Programs Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0512 (HB0604) Office of the Attorney General – Correctional Ombudsman Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0821 Medical Excellence Zone Compact Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0896 State Government - Attorney General - Independent Investigations Division Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/9/2022 4:30 PM
Click to return on the top page