Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Subpoenas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0273
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 (SB0134/CH0836)
Title
Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0425 (SB0359)
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0494 (SB0458)
Title
Campaign Finance – Political Organizations – Prohibitions and Disclosures
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0533 (SB0621)
Title
County Police Accountability Boards – Investigation of Complaints of Police Misconduct
Sponsor
Delegate Ruff
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0746
Title
Education - Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Education - Powers and Notifications
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1002 /CH0140
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Investigative Authority - Health Care Fraud
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1093 /CH0989 (SB1038/CH0990)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Human Relations Commission - Subpoena Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1310
Title
Baltimore City Coordinated Youth Violence Review and Response Team
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1311
Title
Criminal Law - Obscene Material - Device Filters
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425 (SB0998)
Title
Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0027 /CH0329 (HB0383/CH0328)
Title
Cosmetology Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 /CH0836 (HB0297)
Title
Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0359 (HB0425)
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0458 (HB0494)
Title
Campaign Finance - Political Organizations - Prohibitions and Disclosures
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0621 (HB0533)
Title
County Police Accountability Boards - Investigation of Complaints of Police Misconduct
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0998 (HB1425)
Title
Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1038 /CH0990 (HB1093/CH0989)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Human Relations Commission - Subpoena Enforcement
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0273 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2024 - 1:30 PM
HB0297 (SB0134/CH0836) Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding Delegate Davis 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0425 (SB0359) Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0494 (SB0458) Campaign Finance – Political Organizations – Prohibitions and Disclosures Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0533 (SB0621) County Police Accountability Boards – Investigation of Complaints of Police Misconduct Delegate Ruff 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0746 Education - Maryland Office of the Inspector General for Education - Powers and Notifications Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1002 /CH0140 Office of the Attorney General - Investigative Authority - Health Care Fraud Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1093 /CH0989 (SB1038/CH0990) Anne Arundel County - Human Relations Commission - Subpoena Enforcement Delegate Bagnall 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 989
Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1310 Baltimore City Coordinated Youth Violence Review and Response Team Delegate Attar 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1311 Criminal Law - Obscene Material - Device Filters Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1425 (SB0998) Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0027 /CH0329 (HB0383/CH0328) Cosmetology Licensure Compact Senator Gile 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/25/2024 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0134 /CH0836 (HB0297) Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 836
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0359 (HB0425) Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0458 (HB0494) Campaign Finance - Political Organizations - Prohibitions and Disclosures Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0621 (HB0533) County Police Accountability Boards - Investigation of Complaints of Police Misconduct Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0998 (HB1425) Commercial Law - Earned Wage Access Services Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1038 /CH0990 (HB1093/CH0989) Anne Arundel County - Human Relations Commission - Subpoena Enforcement Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 990
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:50 PM
Click to return on the top page