Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Summonses -see also- Subpoenas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0229 (SB0032)
Title
Real Property - Holding Over - Expedited Hearing and Service of Summons for Active Duty Service Members
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0271
Title
Real Property - Expedited Wrongful Detainer Proceedings - Property for Sale or Lease
Sponsor
Delegate Addison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0302
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Statement of Charges - Human Service Workers
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1531
Title
Anne Arundel County - Actions to Repossess for Failure to Pay Rent - Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032 (HB0229)
Title
Real Property - Holding Over - Expedited Hearing and Service of Summons for Active Duty Service Members
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046 (HB0560)
Title
Real Property - Wrongful Detainer - Time of Hearing and Service of Process
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0229 (SB0032) Real Property - Holding Over - Expedited Hearing and Service of Summons for Active Duty Service Members Delegate Chisholm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0271 Real Property - Expedited Wrongful Detainer Proceedings - Property for Sale or Lease Delegate Addison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 3:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2025 - 3:00 PM
HB0302 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Statement of Charges - Human Service Workers Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1531 Anne Arundel County - Actions to Repossess for Failure to Pay Rent - Summons Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Judiciary
SB0032 (HB0229) Real Property - Holding Over - Expedited Hearing and Service of Summons for Active Duty Service Members Senator Gile 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0046 (HB0560) Real Property - Wrongful Detainer - Time of Hearing and Service of Process Senator Watson 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2025 - 2:30 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 10:52 AM
Click to return on the top page