Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Support of Dependents -see also- Alimony

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236
Title
Comptroller – Withholding of Income Tax Refunds – Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0262
Title
Family Law - Nonpayment of Child Support - Sentencing
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0650
Title
Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearage - Workers' Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1293 (SB0884)
Title
Driver's Licenses - Suspension For Child Support Arrearages - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1407 (SB0336)
Title
Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1413
Title
Child Support Enforcement - License Applications - Taxpayer Identification Number
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336 (HB1407)
Title
Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0884 (HB1293)
Title
Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0236 Comptroller – Withholding of Income Tax Refunds – Prohibition Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0262 Family Law - Nonpayment of Child Support - Sentencing Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0650 Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearage - Workers' Compensation Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Judiciary
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1293 (SB0884) Driver's Licenses - Suspension For Child Support Arrearages - Exception Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1407 (SB0336) Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1413 Child Support Enforcement - License Applications - Taxpayer Identification Number Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0336 (HB1407) Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0884 (HB1293) Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Exception Senator Watson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/20/2022 1:16 PM
Click to return on the top page