Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Support of Dependents -see also- Alimony

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136
Title
Child Support Enforcement - Occupational and Recreational Licenses - Taxpayer Identification Number
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 (SB0164)
Title
Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0526
Title
St. Mary's County - Transfer of Child Support Unit and Personnel to the Child Support Administration
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 (SB0071)
Title
Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearages - Workers' Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071 (HB0800)
Title
Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearages - Workers' Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0164 (HB0326)
Title
Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0706
Title
Child Support - Reporting of Employment Information - Independent Contractors
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0711
Title
Child Support - Sports Wagering and Fantasy Competition Intercept
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0136 Child Support Enforcement - Occupational and Recreational Licenses - Taxpayer Identification Number Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/26/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0326 (SB0164) Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Exception Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0526 St. Mary's County - Transfer of Child Support Unit and Personnel to the Child Support Administration St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0800 (SB0071) Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearages - Workers' Compensation Delegate Phillips 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/02/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0071 (HB0800) Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearages - Workers' Compensation Senator Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0164 (HB0326) Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Exception Senator Watson 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0706 Child Support - Reporting of Employment Information - Independent Contractors Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0711 Child Support - Sports Wagering and Fantasy Competition Intercept Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/20/2023 1:06 PM
Click to return on the top page