Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Support of Dependents -see also- Alimony

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205 (SB0104)
Title
Unemployment Insurance Modernization Act of 2024
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0311 (SB0174)
Title
Child Support - Suspension of Driver's Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Simpson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0380 /CH0043 (SB0374/CH0044)
Title
State Emergency Medical Services Board - Licenses and Certificates - Application Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0405 (SB0365)
Title
Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Kaufman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0435 /CH0427
Title
Child Support - Incarcerated Obligors
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0648 (SB0390)
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Actual Income
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813
Title
Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Toles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037 /CH0937 (SB1036/CH0936)
Title
Task Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and Expanded Reentry Services - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Taylor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1045 (SB1011)
Title
Family Law – Child Support – Multifamily Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1405
Title
Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Incarcerated Individual Apprenticeship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0104 (HB0205)
Title
Unemployment Insurance Modernization Act of 2024
Sponsor
Senator Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139
Title
Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0174 (HB0311)
Title
Child Support - Suspension of Driver's Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 (HB0405)
Title
Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374 /CH0044 (HB0380/CH0043)
Title
State Emergency Medical Services Board - Licenses and Certificates - Application Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0390 (HB0648)
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Actual Income
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1011 (HB1045)
Title
Family Law – Child Support – Multifamily Adjustment
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1036 /CH0936 (HB1037/CH0937)
Title
Task Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and Expanded Reentry Services - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0205 (SB0104) Unemployment Insurance Modernization Act of 2024 Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0311 (SB0174) Child Support - Suspension of Driver's Licenses Delegate Simpson 2 2 In the House - Special Order until next session (Delegate Griffith) Adopted
Judiciary
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0380 /CH0043 (SB0374/CH0044) State Emergency Medical Services Board - Licenses and Certificates - Application Requirements Delegate Solomon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0405 (SB0365) Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Delegate Kaufman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0435 /CH0427 Child Support - Incarcerated Obligors Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Judiciary
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0648 (SB0390) Family Law - Child Support - Actual Income Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0813 Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Exception Delegate Toles 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1037 /CH0937 (SB1036/CH0936) Task Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and Expanded Reentry Services - Establishment Delegate Taylor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 937
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1045 (SB1011) Family Law – Child Support – Multifamily Adjustment Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1405 Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Incarcerated Individual Apprenticeship Program Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0104 (HB0205) Unemployment Insurance Modernization Act of 2024 Senator Washington, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0139 Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Exception Senator Watson 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0174 (HB0311) Child Support - Suspension of Driver's Licenses Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (104-30)
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0365 (HB0405) Family Law - Child Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0374 /CH0044 (HB0380/CH0043) State Emergency Medical Services Board - Licenses and Certificates - Application Requirements Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Finance
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0390 (HB0648) Family Law - Child Support - Actual Income Senator Kelly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB1011 (HB1045) Family Law – Child Support – Multifamily Adjustment Senator Charles 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1036 /CH0936 (HB1037/CH0937) Task Force on the Creation of a Division of Returning Citizens and Expanded Reentry Services - Establishment Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 936
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:45 PM
Click to return on the top page