Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Surveyors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0079 (SB0161)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0161 (HB0079)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0974
Title
Department of Natural Resources' Real Property - Exchange With Private Real Property
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0079 (SB0161) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0161 (HB0079) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Senator West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0974 Department of Natural Resources' Real Property - Exchange With Private Real Property Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/7/2022 1:05 PM
Click to return on the top page