Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Surveyors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256 (SB0056)
Title
Courts – Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1230 (SB0288)
Title
Criminal and Civil Trespass - Professional Land Surveyors - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056 (HB0256)
Title
Courts – Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0288 (HB1230)
Title
Criminal and Civil Trespass - Professional Land Surveyors - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0638
Title
Natural Resources - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation Protection Zones - Aerial Surveys
Sponsor
Senator Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0256 (SB0056) Courts – Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/01/2023 - 2:30 PM
HB1230 (SB0288) Criminal and Civil Trespass - Professional Land Surveyors - Exception Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0056 (HB0256) Courts – Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Senator West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0288 (HB1230) Criminal and Civil Trespass - Professional Land Surveyors - Exception Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0638 Natural Resources - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation Protection Zones - Aerial Surveys Senator Mautz 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/02/2023 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/29/2023 11:33 AM
Click to return on the top page