Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Swimming Pools

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0452/CH0941)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0963 (SB0719)
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Solicitation of a Minor, Human Trafficking, and Drug Distribution - Sensitive Locations
Sponsor
Delegate Taveras
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0121
Title
College of Southern Maryland - Funding and Responsibilities - La Plata Pool
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0452 /CH0941 (HB0162)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0719 (HB0963)
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Minors - Sensitive Locations
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0162 (SB0452/CH0941) Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/21/2024 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0963 (SB0719) Criminal Law - Sexual Solicitation of a Minor, Human Trafficking, and Drug Distribution - Sensitive Locations Delegate Taveras 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0121 College of Southern Maryland - Funding and Responsibilities - La Plata Pool Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0452 /CH0941 (HB0162) Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities Senator Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 941
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2024 - 2:30 PM
SB0719 (HB0963) Criminal Law - Crimes Against Minors - Sensitive Locations Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:45 PM
Click to return on the top page