Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Swimming Pools

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0561 (SB0623)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0755 (SB0540)
Title
Common Ownership Communities - Recreational Common Areas - Sensitive Information as Condition for Access
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1519
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0540 (HB0755)
Title
Common Ownership Communities - Recreational Common Areas - Sensitive Information as Condition for Access
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0623 (HB0561)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0561 (SB0623) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0755 (SB0540) Common Ownership Communities - Recreational Common Areas - Sensitive Information as Condition for Access Delegate Foley 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1519 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2025 - 2:40 PM
SB0540 (HB0755) Common Ownership Communities - Recreational Common Areas - Sensitive Information as Condition for Access Senator Charles 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0623 (HB0561) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 3:50 PM
Click to return on the top page