Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Talbot County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0325 (SB0475)
Title
Talbot County – Deer and Turkey Hunting – Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0971
Title
Talbot County Speed Monitoring Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0475 (HB0325)
Title
Talbot County – Deer and Turkey Hunting – Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0325 (SB0475) Talbot County – Deer and Turkey Hunting – Sundays Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0971 Talbot County Speed Monitoring Systems Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0475 (HB0325) Talbot County – Deer and Turkey Hunting – Sundays Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/30/2021 8:26 PM
Click to return on the top page