Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Talbot County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391
Title
County Boards of Education - Elections for Members Representing Specific Districts - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0570 (SB0803)
Title
Talbot County - Hotel Rental Tax - Time of Penalty for Nonpayment
Sponsor
Talbot County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892 (SB0335)
Title
Natural Resources - Canada Geese - Bag Limits
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022 (SB0837)
Title
Oyster Restoration - Use of Federal Funds - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Hutchinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1519
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0803 (HB0570)
Title
Talbot County - Hotel Rental Tax - Time of Penalty for Nonpayment
Sponsor
Talbot County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB1022)
Title
Oyster Restoration - Use of Federal Funds - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0979 (HB1103)
Title
Local Government - Accommodations Intermediaries - Hotel Rental Tax - Collection by Comptroller and Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0391 County Boards of Education - Elections for Members Representing Specific Districts - Alterations Delegate Long, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0570 (SB0803) Talbot County - Hotel Rental Tax - Time of Penalty for Nonpayment Talbot County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0892 (SB0335) Natural Resources - Canada Geese - Bag Limits Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1022 (SB0837) Oyster Restoration - Use of Federal Funds - Prohibition Delegate Hutchinson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1519 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2025 - 2:40 PM
SB0803 (HB0570) Talbot County - Hotel Rental Tax - Time of Penalty for Nonpayment Talbot County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0837 (HB1022) Oyster Restoration - Use of Federal Funds - Prohibition Senator Mautz 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0979 (HB1103) Local Government - Accommodations Intermediaries - Hotel Rental Tax - Collection by Comptroller and Alterations Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 3:50 PM
Click to return on the top page