Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Taxicabs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860
Title
Public Nuisance - Common Carriers - Damage to Public Infrastructure
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0861 (SB1018)
Title
Transportation Network Companies - Weekly Fare and Earnings Summary and Operator Data Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1005
Title
Income Tax - Tips or Gratuities - Subtraction Modification (No Income Taxes on Tips Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0860 Public Nuisance - Common Carriers - Damage to Public Infrastructure Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0861 (SB1018) Transportation Network Companies - Weekly Fare and Earnings Summary and Operator Data Reporting Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1005 Income Tax - Tips or Gratuities - Subtraction Modification (No Income Taxes on Tips Act) Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page