Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Tax Preparers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0034
Title
Income Tax Return Preparers - False Returns or Claims for Refund - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254 (SB0297/CH0053)
Title
State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046
Title
State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Prohibited Acts - Civil Penalty
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0297 /CH0053 (HB0254)
Title
State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0034 Income Tax Return Preparers - False Returns or Claims for Refund - Statute of Limitations Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0254 (SB0297/CH0053) State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0046 State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Prohibited Acts - Civil Penalty Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0297 /CH0053 (HB0254) State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page