Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Tax Sales

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Attorney's Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518
Title
Tax Sales - Redemption of Property - Payments and Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0549 (SB0145)
Title
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Unpaid Water and Sanitary Charges - Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0145 (HB0549)
Title
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Unpaid Water and Sanitary Charges - Collection
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0227
Title
Tax Sales - Redemption of Property - Taxes, Interest, and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0125 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Attorney's Fees Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0518 Tax Sales - Redemption of Property - Payments and Fees Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0549 (SB0145) Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Unpaid Water and Sanitary Charges - Collection Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environmental Matters
SB0145 (HB0549) Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Unpaid Water and Sanitary Charges - Collection Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0227 Tax Sales - Redemption of Property - Taxes, Interest, and Penalties Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM
Click to return on the top page