Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Tax Sales

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 /CH0484
Title
Baltimore City - Abandoned Property - Tax Sales - Ground Rent
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0566 (SB0142)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale Advertising
Sponsor
Delegate Sophocleus
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0762
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970 /CH0566 (SB0591/CH0565)
Title
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1153
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 431-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0142 (HB0566)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale Advertising
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0591 /CH0565 (HB0970/CH0566)
Title
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0385 /CH0484 Baltimore City - Abandoned Property - Tax Sales - Ground Rent Delegate Anderson 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0566 (SB0142) Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale Advertising Delegate Sophocleus 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0762 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0970 /CH0566 (SB0591/CH0565) Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1153 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 431-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0142 (HB0566) Anne Arundel County - Tax Sale Advertising Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0456 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Budget and Taxation
SB0591 /CH0565 (HB0970/CH0566) Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 3:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM
Click to return on the top page