Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Tax Sales

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0509
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Nonprofit Entity-Owned Real Property
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0522 /CH0597
Title
St. Mary's County - Tax Sales - Auctioneer Expenses
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0979
Title
Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program - Automatic Enrollment and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 /CH0663
Title
Tax Sales - Alternative Collection Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0194
Title
Property Tax - Deadline Extension for Homeowners to Redeem Property Involved in a Tax Sale
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939
Title
Tax Sales - Property Maintenance and Nuisance Condition Violation Judgments
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0967
Title
Tax Sales - Final Judgments in Foreclosure Actions - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0968
Title
Tax Sales - Foreclosure Actions - Assignment of Certificates of Sale
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0980
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Restriction of Bidders
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991
Title
Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Rights of Redemption
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1001
Title
Property Tax – Withholding of Property From Tax Sale – Demolition
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0509 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Nonprofit Entity-Owned Real Property Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0522 /CH0597 St. Mary's County - Tax Sales - Auctioneer Expenses St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 597
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0979 Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program - Automatic Enrollment and Funding Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1196 /CH0663 Tax Sales - Alternative Collection Programs Delegate Branch, C. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0194 Property Tax - Deadline Extension for Homeowners to Redeem Property Involved in a Tax Sale Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0939 Tax Sales - Property Maintenance and Nuisance Condition Violation Judgments Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0967 Tax Sales - Final Judgments in Foreclosure Actions - Revisions Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0968 Tax Sales - Foreclosure Actions - Assignment of Certificates of Sale Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0980 Property Tax - Tax Sales - Restriction of Bidders Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0991 Tax Sales - Foreclosure of Rights of Redemption Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1001 Property Tax – Withholding of Property From Tax Sale – Demolition Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:24 PM
Click to return on the top page