Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Television -see also- Cable Television

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017
Title
Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0293 (SB0274)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Child Victims - Testimony in Child Abuse Cases
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525 (SB0361)
Title
Election Law - Influencing a Voter By Dissemination of a Deepfake - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0931 (SB0591)
Title
Environment - Covered Electronic Device Recycling Program - Establishment (Electronics Recycling Health and Safety Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0293)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Child Victims - Testimony in Child Abuse Cases
Sponsor
Senator Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0340
Title
Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361 (HB0525)
Title
Election Law - Influence on a Voter's Voting Decision By Use of Fraud - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0591 (HB0931)
Title
Environment - Covered Electronic Device Recycling Program - Establishment (Electronics Recycling Health and Safety Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2025 - 11:00 AM
HB0293 (SB0274) Criminal Procedure - Child Victims - Testimony in Child Abuse Cases Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0525 (SB0361) Election Law - Influencing a Voter By Dissemination of a Deepfake - Prohibition Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0931 (SB0591) Environment - Covered Electronic Device Recycling Program - Establishment (Electronics Recycling Health and Safety Modernization Act) Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 (HB0293) Criminal Procedure - Child Victims - Testimony in Child Abuse Cases Senator Love 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0340 Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2025 - 10:30 AM
SB0361 (HB0525) Election Law - Influence on a Voter's Voting Decision By Use of Fraud - Prohibition Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (39-8)
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2025 - 2:15 PM
SB0591 (HB0931) Environment - Covered Electronic Device Recycling Program - Establishment (Electronics Recycling Health and Safety Modernization Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/7/2025 11:59 PM
Click to return on the top page