Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Textbooks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0967 (SB0424/CH0763)
Title
The Textbook Cost Savings Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1337
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0424 /CH0763 (HB0967)
Title
The Textbook Cost Savings Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0967 (SB0424/CH0763) The Textbook Cost Savings Act of 2017 Delegate Frick 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1337 Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0424 /CH0763 (HB0967) The Textbook Cost Savings Act of 2017 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 763
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM
Click to return on the top page