Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Theaters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0733
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Maryland Hall for the Creative Arts
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114 (SB0892)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 (SB0995)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters PG 303-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1298 (SB0590)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Shakespeare Company Theatre
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1430 /CH0429 (SB0492)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater License)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1581 (SB1112)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Center Stage
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0492 (HB1430/CH0429)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater License)
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590 (HB1298)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Shakespeare Company Theatre
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892 (HB1114)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0995 (HB1266)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1112 (HB1581)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Center Stage
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0733 Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Maryland Hall for the Creative Arts Delegate Busch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 11:00 AM
HB1114 (SB0892) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1266 (SB0995) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters PG 303-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1298 (SB0590) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Shakespeare Company Theatre Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 11:00 AM
HB1430 /CH0429 (SB0492) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater License) Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1581 (SB1112) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Center Stage Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0492 (HB1430/CH0429) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater License) Washington County Senators 4 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0590 (HB1298) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Shakespeare Company Theatre Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0892 (HB1114) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0995 (HB1266) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1112 (HB1581) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Center Stage Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM
Click to return on the top page