Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Theaters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0280 /CH0748
Title
Washington County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class CT License
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572 (SB0486)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0641 /CH0258 (SB0597/CH0259)
Title
Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 /CH0061
Title
Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1180 /CH0768 (SB0645)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Dinner Theater License
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1238
Title
Places of Public Accommodation - Motion Picture Houses - Captioning
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0572)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0597 /CH0259 (HB0641/CH0258)
Title
Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0645 (HB1180/CH0768)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Dinner Theater License
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0685
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Charles County Multicultural Recreational and Amphitheatre Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0280 /CH0748 Washington County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class CT License Washington County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 748
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0572 (SB0486) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0641 /CH0258 (SB0597/CH0259) Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Ways and Means
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0897 /CH0061 Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/08/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1180 /CH0768 (SB0645) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Dinner Theater License Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 768
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1238 Places of Public Accommodation - Motion Picture Houses - Captioning Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 (HB0572) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0597 /CH0259 (HB0641/CH0258) Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259
Budget and Taxation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0645 (HB1180/CH0768) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Dinner Theater License Senator Carozza 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0685 Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Charles County Multicultural Recreational and Amphitheatre Facilities Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:32 PM
Click to return on the top page