Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Threats -see also- Harrassment; Violence

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 (SB0078)
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084 (SB0119)
Title
Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0267 (SB0298)
Title
Criminal Law - Threat Against Public Health Official or Hospital Staff Member
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 (SB0530)
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0495 (SB0519)
Title
Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1167
Title
Public Health - Abortions - Coercion (Coercive Abuse Against Mothers Prevention Act)
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255 /CH0031 (SB0705)
Title
Education - Physical Restraint and Seclusion - Limitations, Reporting, and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409 (SB0956)
Title
Criminal Law – Threats to Public Officials
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078 (HB0072)
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0119 (HB0084)
Title
Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207 /CH0231
Title
Insurance Carriers and Managed Care Organizations - Cybersecurity Standards
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0298 (HB0267)
Title
Criminal Law - Threat Against Public Health Official or Hospital Staff Member
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0519 (HB0495)
Title
Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530 (HB0431)
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 (HB1255/CH0031)
Title
Education – Physical Restraint and Seclusion – Limitations, Reporting, and Training
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0956 (HB1409)
Title
Criminal Law - Threats to Public Officials
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0007
Title
Support of Parents’ Rights to Bring Grievances to County Boards of Education
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 (SB0078) Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0084 (SB0119) Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0267 (SB0298) Criminal Law - Threat Against Public Health Official or Hospital Staff Member Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0431 (SB0530) Maryland Fair Scheduling Act Delegate Foley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0495 (SB0519) Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1167 Public Health - Abortions - Coercion (Coercive Abuse Against Mothers Prevention Act) Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1255 /CH0031 (SB0705) Education - Physical Restraint and Seclusion - Limitations, Reporting, and Training Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 31
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1409 (SB0956) Criminal Law – Threats to Public Officials Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0078 (HB0072) Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0119 (HB0084) Education – Crimes on School Grounds – Application Senator Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0207 /CH0231 Insurance Carriers and Managed Care Organizations - Cybersecurity Standards Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0298 (HB0267) Criminal Law - Threat Against Public Health Official or Hospital Staff Member Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0519 (HB0495) Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0530 (HB0431) Maryland Fair Scheduling Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0705 (HB1255/CH0031) Education – Physical Restraint and Seclusion – Limitations, Reporting, and Training Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2022 - 1:03 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0956 (HB1409) Criminal Law - Threats to Public Officials Senator Watson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SJ0007 Support of Parents’ Rights to Bring Grievances to County Boards of Education Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:33 AM
Click to return on the top page