Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Tobacco and Nicotine

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028 /CH0319 (SB0062/CH0320)
Title
Pharmacists - Nicotine Replacement Therapy Medication
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0442 (SB0249)
Title
Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0477 (SB0099)
Title
Cigarettes, Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices – Local Law Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0789
Title
Prince George's County - Cigarettes and Other Tobacco Products - Licensing Conditions
Sponsor
Delegate Harrison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1227
Title
Regulation of Tobacco Products - Synthetic Nicotine
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295
Title
Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1341
Title
Prince George’s County – Other Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices – Requirements and Limitations
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 /CH0320 (HB0028/CH0319)
Title
Pharmacists - Nicotine Replacement Therapy Medication
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099 (HB0477)
Title
Cigarettes, Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices – Local Law Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0249 (HB0442)
Title
Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0315
Title
Business Regulation - Miscellaneous State Business Licenses - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0990
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibitions and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 /CH0319 (SB0062/CH0320) Pharmacists - Nicotine Replacement Therapy Medication Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Health and Government Operations
1/20/2022 - 4:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
HB0442 (SB0249) Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0477 (SB0099) Cigarettes, Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices – Local Law Authorization Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0789 Prince George's County - Cigarettes and Other Tobacco Products - Licensing Conditions Delegate Harrison 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1227 Regulation of Tobacco Products - Synthetic Nicotine Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1253 Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1295 Multifamily Dwellings - Smoking Policies Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1341 Prince George’s County – Other Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices – Requirements and Limitations Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0062 /CH0320 (HB0028/CH0319) Pharmacists - Nicotine Replacement Therapy Medication Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0099 (HB0477) Cigarettes, Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices – Local Law Authorization Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0249 (HB0442) Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 /CH0315 Business Regulation - Miscellaneous State Business Licenses - Alterations Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Finance
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0990 Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibitions and Requirements Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/12/2022 3:05 PM
Click to return on the top page