Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Torts -see also- Libel and Slander; Med Malp; Wrongful Death

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130 (SB0263)
Title
Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 (SB0502)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0959 (SB0676/CH0304)
Title
Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of Information
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1156 (SB0819)
Title
Maryland Contributory Negligence Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1182
Title
Courts - Commission to Study Maryland's Fault Allocation System
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0263 (HB0130)
Title
Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0502 (HB0600)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 /CH0304 (HB0959)
Title
Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of Information
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0711
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Primary Care Coalition of Montgomery County
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0819 (HB1156)
Title
Maryland Contributory Negligence Act
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0130 (SB0263) Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0600 (SB0502) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
HB0959 (SB0676/CH0304) Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of Information Delegate Lee 4 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1156 (SB0819) Maryland Contributory Negligence Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1182 Courts - Commission to Study Maryland's Fault Allocation System Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0263 (HB0130) Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0502 (HB0600) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0676 /CH0304 (HB0959) Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of Information Senator Pugh 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0711 Local Government Tort Claims Act - Primary Care Coalition of Montgomery County Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0819 (HB1156) Maryland Contributory Negligence Act Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM
Click to return on the top page