Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Torts -see also- Libel and Slander; Med Malp; Wrongful Death

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0452/CH0941)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382 /CH0607 (SB0344/CH0606)
Title
Criminal and Civil Trespass - Professional Land Surveyors - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Schmidt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 /CH0611 (SB0793/CH0610)
Title
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Sheriffs and Deputy Sheriffs - County Responsibility
Sponsor
Delegate Embry
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1361
Title
Task Force to Study Various Aspects of Changing Contributory Negligence to Comparative Negligence Act
Sponsor
Delegate Wu
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 /CH0606 (HB0382/CH0607)
Title
Criminal and Civil Trespass - Professional Land Surveyors - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0452 /CH0941 (HB0162)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793 /CH0610 (HB0895/CH0611)
Title
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Sheriffs and Deputy Sheriffs - County Responsibility
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility, Inc.
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1031
Title
Civil Actions - Lead Poisoning - Liability and Statute of Limitations (Maryland Lead Poisoning Compensation Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0162 (SB0452/CH0941) Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/21/2024 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0382 /CH0607 (SB0344/CH0606) Criminal and Civil Trespass - Professional Land Surveyors - Exception Delegate Schmidt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0895 /CH0611 (SB0793/CH0610) Maryland Tort Claims Act - Sheriffs and Deputy Sheriffs - County Responsibility Delegate Embry 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611
Judiciary
2/21/2024 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1361 Task Force to Study Various Aspects of Changing Contributory Negligence to Comparative Negligence Act Delegate Wu 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
SB0344 /CH0606 (HB0382/CH0607) Criminal and Civil Trespass - Professional Land Surveyors - Exception Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0452 /CH0941 (HB0162) Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities Senator Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 941
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2024 - 2:30 PM
SB0793 /CH0610 (HB0895/CH0611) Maryland Tort Claims Act - Sheriffs and Deputy Sheriffs - County Responsibility Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 610
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0849 Local Government Tort Claims Act - Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility, Inc. Senator Corderman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2024 - 2:30 PM
SB1031 Civil Actions - Lead Poisoning - Liability and Statute of Limitations (Maryland Lead Poisoning Compensation Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:46 PM
Click to return on the top page