Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Torts -see also- Libel and Slander; Med Malp; Wrongful Death

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456
Title
Civil Actions - Child Nonsexual Abuse and Neglect - Damages and Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Spiegel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487 (SB0484)
Title
Unhoused Individuals - Rights, Civil Action, and Affirmative Defense
Sponsor
Delegate Mireku-North
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0818
Title
Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right
Sponsor
Delegate Ruff
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1378 /CH0104
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1507 (SB0271/CH0133)
Title
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Employees of an Office of a Sheriff
Sponsor
Delegate Toles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271 /CH0133 (HB1507)
Title
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Employees of an Office of a Sheriff
Sponsor
Senator Jackson, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 (HB0487)
Title
Unhoused Individuals - Rights, Civil Action, and Affirmative Defense
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0579
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility, Inc.
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743
Title
Civil Actions - Maryland Transit Administration - Limitation of Tort Liability
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0456 Civil Actions - Child Nonsexual Abuse and Neglect - Damages and Statute of Limitations Delegate Spiegel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0487 (SB0484) Unhoused Individuals - Rights, Civil Action, and Affirmative Defense Delegate Mireku-North 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0818 Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right Delegate Ruff 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2025 - 11:00 AM
HB1378 /CH0104 Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Judiciary
3/26/2025 - 3:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/04/2025 - 3:00 PM
HB1507 (SB0271/CH0133) Maryland Tort Claims Act - Employees of an Office of a Sheriff Delegate Toles 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Judiciary
SB0271 /CH0133 (HB1507) Maryland Tort Claims Act - Employees of an Office of a Sheriff Senator Jackson, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2025 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/26/2025 - 3:15 PM
SB0484 (HB0487) Unhoused Individuals - Rights, Civil Action, and Affirmative Defense Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0579 Local Government Tort Claims Act - Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility, Inc. Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 Civil Actions - Maryland Transit Administration - Limitation of Tort Liability Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/24/2025 10:37 AM
Click to return on the top page