Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Tourism -see also- Agritourism

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0741 /CH0616 (SB0804/CH0615)
Title
Northwest Baltimore County Sports Tourism Facility - Feasibility Study
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0787 /CH0528 (SB1134/CH0527)
Title
Allegany County - Allegany Regional Recreational Economic Development Authority - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 (SB0896/CH0635)
Title
Baltimore Convention and Tourism Redevelopment and Operating Organization Task Force
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1032 /CH0458
Title
Highways – Tourist Area and Corridor Signage Program
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1281 /CH0239 (SB0014/CH0240)
Title
Economic Development - Tourism Zones - Designation and Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0014 /CH0240 (HB1281/CH0239)
Title
Economic Development - Tourism Zones - Designation and Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 /CH1044
Title
Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2024
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0645 (HB0530)
Title
Maryland Trails Advisory Committee and the Maryland Office of Trails - Establishment (Great Maryland Trails Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0804 /CH0615 (HB0741/CH0616)
Title
Northwest Baltimore County Sports Tourism Facility – Feasibility Study
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0896 /CH0635 (HB0897)
Title
Baltimore Convention and Tourism Redevelopment and Operating Authority Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Carter
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1070
Title
Financial Institutions - Heritage Areas - Canal Place
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1134 /CH0527 (HB0787/CH0528)
Title
Allegany County - Allegany Regional Recreational Economic Development Authority - Established
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0741 /CH0616 (SB0804/CH0615) Northwest Baltimore County Sports Tourism Facility - Feasibility Study Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Appropriations
2/28/2024 - 12:30 PM
Finance
HB0787 /CH0528 (SB1134/CH0527) Allegany County - Allegany Regional Recreational Economic Development Authority - Established Delegate Buckel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Ways and Means
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0897 (SB0896/CH0635) Baltimore Convention and Tourism Redevelopment and Operating Organization Task Force Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Hayes) Adopted
Appropriations
3/05/2024 - 12:30 PM
Finance
HB1032 /CH0458 Highways – Tourist Area and Corridor Signage Program Delegate Solomon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1281 /CH0239 (SB0014/CH0240) Economic Development - Tourism Zones - Designation and Benefits Delegate Hartman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Ways and Means
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0014 /CH0240 (HB1281/CH0239) Economic Development - Tourism Zones - Designation and Benefits Senator Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2024 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB0428 /CH1044 Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2024 Senator McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1044
Finance
2/23/2024 - 10:00 AM
Economic Matters
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0645 (HB0530) Maryland Trails Advisory Committee and the Maryland Office of Trails - Establishment (Great Maryland Trails Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/16/2024 - 9:00 AM
SB0804 /CH0615 (HB0741/CH0616) Northwest Baltimore County Sports Tourism Facility – Feasibility Study Senator Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 615
Finance
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0896 /CH0635 (HB0897) Baltimore Convention and Tourism Redevelopment and Operating Authority Task Force Senator Carter 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635
Finance
3/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1070 Financial Institutions - Heritage Areas - Canal Place Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB1134 /CH0527 (HB0787/CH0528) Allegany County - Allegany Regional Recreational Economic Development Authority - Established Senator McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Finance
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:53 PM
Click to return on the top page